Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SYNCHRONY -V- NAVADECHAVEZ Print
On October 13, 2017 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 13, 2017
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: Jan 08, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: Nov 13, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Oct 13, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: Oct 13, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Oct 13, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Oct 13, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2018 | |||
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 17, 2018 | |||
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TERESA NAVADECHAVEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED. |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR 1ST APP FEES 171017-0554-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 171017-0554-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 712508 | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Prayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/13/17 |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,117.86 | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17 |