Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE -V- VASQUEZ Print
On October 13, 2017 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 13, 2017
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: Jan 11, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: Jan 11, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: Jan 11, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: Jan 11, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: Oct 13, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Oct 13, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Oct 13, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Oct 13, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
October 15, 2018 | |||
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 180612-0095-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180612-0095-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 090867 | |
April 13, 2018 | |||
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 5076.09 ) |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 180301-1107-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180301-1107-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 084250 |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WILLIAM E VASQUEZ FILED. |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF BLEIER & COX FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. CHANGES ITS NAME TO PATENAUDE & FELIX APC FILED |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 01/11/18 JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM E VASQUEZ JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,741.09 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5051.09 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF CCP585 FILED |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF CCP1033 FILED |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO WILLIAM E VASQUEZ. |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO WILLIAM E VASQUEZ SERVED ON 10/26/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00. |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17 | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL. |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 171017-0344-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 171017-0344-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 002589 | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,741.09 | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |