Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BARCLAYS DELAWARE -V- MIRABELLI Print
On October 12, 2017 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 12, 2017
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Declaration re:
Date: Mar 07, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: Mar 07, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: Mar 07, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: Nov 14, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: Oct 12, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Oct 12, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Oct 12, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Oct 12, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2018 | |||
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 12, 2018 | |||
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE ORDERED ENTERED 03/07/18 JUDGMENT FOR: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE JUDGMENT AGAINST: DAWN M MIRABELLI JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,993.02 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4302.52 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE AS TO DAWN M MIRABELLI. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033 FILED. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DAWN M MIRABELLI FILED. |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DAWN M MIRABELLI; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED. |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Prayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/12/17 |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,993.02 | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL. |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 171013-0273-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 171013-0273-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 57293 | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17 | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |