Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PORTFOLIO -V- JONES Print
On May 16, 2014 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 16, 2014
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Transfer
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: Jul 14, 2014Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: Jun 18, 2014Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Notice Imaged
Date: May 16, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2015 | |||
November 10, 2014 | |||
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CORINE FORSS JONES WITH COSTS OF $55.00 |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE 140520-0199-CK CDL/ 196.00 PAYMT 140520-0199-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 00990286 | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33J | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |