Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND-V-SMITH Print
On November 20, 2013 a rule 3.740 collections -reduced filing fee limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Cheryl A. Houde presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 20, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Ross, Edward;Category
Collections-Dec. Reduced Filing Fee BP6322.1(c)(1)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
8 months and 2 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: Aug 05, 2014Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: Jul 29, 2014Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: Jul 24, 2014Notice Imaged
Date: Apr 07, 2014Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Nov 20, 2013Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: Nov 20, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Nov 20, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Nov 20, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2014 | |||
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST HAVE AN ORDER IN ORDER TO CHANGE DISMISSAL FROM WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO WITH. |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE HAS BEEN DISMISSED . |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
May 23, 2014 |
Judge: Ross, Edward |
||
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE EDWARD M ROSS,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY Cheryl Houde FOR PLAINTIFF. - PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HELD PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. REASON: REQUEST MORE TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/29/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23J. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENTS23J confidential minute: NOTICE PRINTED FOR C MIDLAND FUNDING, LL ON 4/07/14. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 5/23/14 AT 8:30 IN S23J IS RESCHEDULED TO AT | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENTS23J | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 5/23/14 AT 8:30 IN S32 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23J | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED. | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,101.30 | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)). 131120-1398-CK CDL/ 196.00 PAYMT | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 |