Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND FUNDING -V- ALVARADO Print
On November 20, 2013 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 20, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections-CRC3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
4 months and 23 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed
Date: Sep 28, 2020Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles
Date: May 22, 2020Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: Apr 14, 2014Req for Ent of Default and Req for Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: Apr 14, 2014Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: Apr 14, 2014Notice Imaged
Date: Apr 07, 2014Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: Dec 18, 2013Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Nov 20, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Nov 20, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Nov 20, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed Cost $25.00 / Credit $122.03 / Interest $0 |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $40.00 check paid on 02/23/21 for writ of execution |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00. |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( $5,734.54 ) |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 190426-0616-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190426-0616-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 003055389 |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Credit Filed. Credit in the Amount of ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $122.03) FILED. |
|
May 23, 2014 | |||
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 04/14/14 JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAN ALVARADO JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,523.57 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $308.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5831.57 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Req for Ent of Default and Req for Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JAN ALVARADO. |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT CCP 585 FILED. |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | PRAYER FOR INTEREST ENDING DATE OF 04/14/14 | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF CCP 1033 FILED |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO JAN ALVARADO. |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT CLERK'S CALENDAR | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COLLECTIONS JUDGMENT WORKSHEET PRINTED. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 5/23/14 AT 8:30 IN S36 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 5/23/14 AT 8:30 IN S30J IS RESCHEDULED TO AT | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENTS30J confidential minute: NOTICE PRINTED FOR C MIDLAND FUNDING, LL ON 4/07/14. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30J | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENTS30J | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAN ALVARADO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/09/13 WITH COSTS OF $68.00 FILED. |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Prayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 11/20/13 |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36 | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,523.57 | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED 131120-1346-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT |