Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS. LIZETTE G MEDINA ET AL
On December 14, 2021 an exempt collections (rule 3.740) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 14, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
15 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. against Lizette G Medina in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-21-597120. The plaintiff's attorneys are Christina Arnold, Hyo Jin Julia Jung…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67279682) | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT LIZETTE MEDINA (TRANSACTION ID # 200046452) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200045907) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MEDINA, LIZETTE G DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-13-2022 | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 200045907) TO PLAINTIFF MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 200045907) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 200045907) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: FEE (TRANSACTION ID # 200045907) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. |