Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DONNA TREVETHAN VS. BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. ET AL
On October 08, 2019 an other non exempt complaints case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 08, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS
Status
Settlement
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. The plaintiff, Donna Trevethan, is suing the defendant, Big Orange Productions, Inc. et al, in the Superior Court of California, San Francisco County. The case number is CG…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: Sep 14, 2021NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Oct 08, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | hearing |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, COMPLIANCE HEARING HELD. GRANTED. JUDGE: RICHARD B\. ULMER; CLERK: W. TRUPEK; NOT REPORTED (302/RBU) | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-13-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
June 06, 2022 | hearing |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF THOMAS SEGAL REGARDING FAILURE TO APPEAR AT JUNE 6, 2022 COMPLIANCE HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67695444) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, COMPLIANCE HEARING IS CONTINUED TO JUNE 13, 2022 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 302. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT IS TO SEND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: RICHARD B\. ULMER; CLERK: W. TRUPEK; NOT REPORTED (302/RBU) | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-06-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF EVELIN REYES REGARDING DISBURSEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67691968) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF THOMAS SEGAL REGARDING SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR DISBURSEMENT REPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 67689662) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF EVELIN REYES REGARDING DISBURSEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67691904) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
October 27, 2021 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-27-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66983273) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS | |
September 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR, SET FOR HEARING ON TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 AT 9:30AM IN COURTROOM 302: LINE 5, Final Approval Hearing Plaintiffs motion for final approval of class action settlement, awa... | |
September 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR, SET FOR HEARING ON TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 AT 9:30AM IN COURTROOM 302: LINE 5, PLAINTIFF DONNA TREVETHANs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action S... | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT ON FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT | |
September 14, 2021 | hearing |
Final Approval Hearing
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
September 14, 2021 | hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement, Award Of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement Of Litigation Costs, And Enhancement Award
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF DONNA TREVETHAN'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION COSTS, AND ENHANCEMENT AWARD IS GRANTED. [SEE MINI MINUTES FOR DETAILS.] COMPLIANCE HEARING SET FOR JUNE 6, 2022 AT 9:30AM IN DEPT 302. PARTIES TO FILE A DECLARATION RE STATUS OF DISTRIBUTION PRIOR TO THIS HEARING DATE. ORDER AND JUDGMENT ARE SIGNED. JUDGE: ETHAN P\. SCHULMAN, CLERK: S. LE, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, REPORTED. =(302/EPS) | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, FINAL APPROVAL HEARING, OFF CALENDAR DUPLICATE ENTRY. | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR COMPLIANCE HEARING HEARING SET FOR JUN-06-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-14-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF NORMAN ALCANTARA REGARDING NOTICE AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66887424) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ERRATA (TRANSACTION ID # 66872284) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SHAUN SETAREH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION COSTS, AND ENHANCEMENT AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 66870470) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NORMAN ALCANTARA REGARDING NOTICE AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66870470) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION COSTS, AND ENHANCEMENT AWARD; **COURT REPORTER FEES PAID** (TRANSACTION ID # 66870470) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR SEP-14-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DONNA TREVETHAN (TRANSACTION ID # 66870470) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
June 16, 2021 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66642982) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-16-2021 CONTINUED TO OCT-27-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Law amp; Motion Calendar for Wednesday, April 14, 2021, Line 6, PLAINTIFF DONNA TREVETHANs Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement And Certification Of Settlement Cl... | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS | |
April 14, 2021 | hearing |
Plaintiffs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement And Certification Of Settlement Class; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-14-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR FINAL APPROVAL HEARING HEARING SET FOR SEP-14-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF DONNA TREVETHAN'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS. MATTER CALLED. DISCUSSIONS REGARDING THE FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING DATE ARE HELD. THE FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING IS SET FOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 302. A REPORT FROM THE SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR IS TO BE ON FILE NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 9, 2021. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: ETHAN P\. SCHULMAN; CLERK: JACQUELINE ALAMEDA; COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR NO. 8600, EMAIL: MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM. (302/EPS) | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF THOMAS SEGAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS (ATTACHING AMENDMENT TO STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT) (TRANSACTION ID # 66510866) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
April 07, 2021 | hearing |
Plaintiffs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement And Certification Of Settlement Class; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF DONNA TREVETHAN'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS. MATTER CALLED. DISCUSSIONS ARE HELD. AT THE CONCLUSION OF DISCUSSIONS, PLAINTIFF DONNA TREVETHAN'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS IS CONTINUED TO APRIL 14, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 302. A SHORT DECLARATION AUTHENTICATING A SIGNED AMENDMENT ADDRESSING THE TWO ISSUES RAISED BY THE COURT IS TO BE FILED BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON APRIL 13, 2021. JUDGE: ETHAN P\. SCHULMAN; CLERK: JACQUELINE ALAMEDA; COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR NO. 8600, EMAIL: MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM. (302/EPS) | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-07-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 66440413) FILED BY ATTORNEY SETAREH, SHAUN | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SHAUN SETAREH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS (TRANSACTION ID # 66413684) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 66413684) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR APR-07-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 66413684) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
February 17, 2021 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-17-2021 CONTINUED TO JUN-16-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF SETTLEMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66289639) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 66226555) FILED BY ATTORNEY MCKELVEY, BRANDON REED | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF MCKELVEY, BRANDON REED ON DEC-24-2020 THROUGH JAN-01-2021 (TRANSACTION ID # 66169088) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
October 14, 2020 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-14-2020 CONTINUED TO FEB-17-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF SETTLEMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 65965678) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 65876271) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED | |
April 15, 2020 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-15-2020 CONTINUED TO OCT-14-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64847469) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS | |
March 11, 2020 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 64808516) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES TO 9-10-20 | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-11-2020 CONTINUED TO APR-15-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION. (MJ) | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64741852) FILED BY DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64741852) FILED BY DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64735060) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 64738329) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64730202) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES & FILING FEE PAID FOR PROPOSED ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 64708314) FILED BY DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 64601595) FILED BY DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64601595) FILED BY DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION /JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 64464659) FILED BY TARGET CORPORATION BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64464659) FILED BY DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC. | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100086318), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED OCT-10-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TARGET CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TREVETHAN, DONNA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BIG ORANGE PRODUCTIONS, INC., A RHODE ISLAND CORPORATION TARGET CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-11-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-09-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-18-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |