Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A VS. DERREKK K SOUDERS ET AL
On August 14, 2018 an exempt collections (rule 3.740) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 14, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
10 months and 18 days
Overview
Causes of Action
of Service on defendant(s) of Summons and Complaint.
requires that responsive papers to an order to show cause must be filed and served at
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2019 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-23-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100045608) | |
April 23, 2019 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-23-2019 CONTINUED TO JUL-23-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100044401) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-23-2019 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100037583) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100037460) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A AS TO DEFENDANT SOUDERS, DERREKK K DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-11-2019 |