Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ANTHONY E. HELD VS. TNT SALES GOLDEN INC. ET AL
On March 08, 2018 an other non exempt complaints case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 08, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 months and 12 days
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a case between Anthony E. Held, Ph.D., P.E. as the plaintiff/petitioner and TNT Sales Golden Inc. and TNT Sales Co. as the defendant/respondent. The document provides details of the serv…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-08-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62190648) | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62002429), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E. PH.D., P.E. SERVED APR-30-2018, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT TNT SALES GOLDEN INC. | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61994423), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E. PH.D., P.E. SERVED APR-30-2018, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT TNT SALES CO. | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HELD, ANTHONY E. PH.D., P.E. AS TO DEFENDANT TNT SALES GOLDEN INC. TNT SALES CO. DOES 1 TO 150, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-08-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-07-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-16-2018 | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |