Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
800 MARKET STREET LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY VS. DIESEL USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL
On January 24, 2018 a contract/warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
CONTRACT/WARRANTY
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 24 days
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by 800 Market Street LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, against Diesel USA Inc., a Delaware corporation, and Does 1-10. The complaint alleges that Diesel USA, Inc. is in possession of approximately 11,297 square fe…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-08-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62244868) | |
June 27, 2018 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-27-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-08-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 800 MARKET STREET LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DB 800 MARKET LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT DIESEL USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-27-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-26-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2018 | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |