Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SOFI CONSUMER LOAN PROGRAM 2017-2 LLC VS. MICHAEL COSTELLO ET AL
On January 23, 2018 a common counts/open book account/collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 23, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-08-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62251986) | |
June 27, 2018 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-27-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-08-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62100671) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOFI CONSUMER LOAN PROGRAM 2017-2 LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 61759284) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOFI CONSUMER LOAN PROGRAM 2017-2 LLC | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP § 395(B); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 61759284) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOFI CONSUMER LOAN PROGRAM 2017-2 LLC | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18037006), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOFI CONSUMER LOAN PROGRAM 2017-2 LLC SERVED FEB-01-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT COSTELLO, MICHAEL | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOFI CONSUMER LOAN PROGRAM 2017-2 LLC AS TO DEFENDANT COSTELLO, MICHAEL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-27-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-26-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2018 |