Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JUNKO HARUTA VS. PHAT LU ET AL
On November 05, 2014 a personal injury/property damage - vehicle related case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2014
Last Refreshed
November 23, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2015 | hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100003378) | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-11-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 20, 2015 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR AUG-11-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE MAY-20-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 08, 2015 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15082066) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARUTA, JUNKO | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-08-2015 CONTINUED TO MAY-20-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARUTA, JUNKO AS TO DEFENDANT LU, PHAT DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-08-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-05-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-16-2015 | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |