Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC VS. BELISARIO A PORTILLO
On April 23, 2012 an exempt collections (rule 3.740) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 23, 2012
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
6 years, 10 months and 19 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED ($.00 ON INTEREST, $.00 ON PRINCIPAL), $6,944.79 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 67723589) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: HARRIS, STELIOS A. SUBSTITUTED FOR MERRILL, ANN K. AS ATTORNEY FOR ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC | |
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A $6,569.92 PRINCIPAL, $1,108.80 INTEREST, $290.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,968.72, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION CHRISTINE S. LOUIE FILED RE: CCP SECTION 1033(B)(2) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC SERVED MAY-19-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A | |
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC SERVED MAY-19-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT PORTILLO, BELISARIO A SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-22-2012 | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(B); VENUE FOR PERSONAL,FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC |