Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK VS. LUCIO LUNA et al
On February 06, 2008 a common counts/open book account/collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 06, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 09, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 11 days
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a case between Capital One Bank and Lucio Luna. The case number is CGC-08-471885 and the filing date is March 5, 2008. The document includes information about the attorney representing t…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10
Date: May 29, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Feb 06, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
September 05, 2008 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF SEP-05-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
June 06, 2008 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LUNA, LUCIO $1,955.68 PRINCIPAL, $485.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $229.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,669.68, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE: WAIVE INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $229.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $275.28 AS TO DEFENDANT LUNA, LUCIO | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR JUDGMENT ( CCP 585 (D) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING 1033 NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE: WAIVER DIFFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 HOURS | |
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-06-2008 CONTINUED TO SEP-05-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK SERVED FEB-25-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT LUNA, LUCIO | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK AS TO DEFENDANT LUNA, LUCIO DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-06-2008 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-04-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-22-2008 | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |