Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK VS. DORIAN R. MORGAN et al
On January 14, 2008 a common counts/open book account/collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 14, 2008
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 4 days
Overview
Causes of Action
4. Number of causes of action specify
5. The cause of action hereinafter stated is a money demand,
FACTUAL ALLEGATIONS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
. FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION wo (Breach of Contract) (As Against All Defendants)
2. Money Had and Received
3. Account Stated
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a request for dismissal of a case filed by Capital One Bank against Dorian R. Morgan. The case number is CGC-08-471075 and the filing date is May 2, 2008. The document is a lead sheet for document scanning and does not provide a…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY LAVINSKY, IVAN S | |
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MORGAN, DORIAN R. | |
August 15, 2008 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF AUG-15-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $85.42 INTEREST, $35.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MORGAN, DORIAN R. | |
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 16, 2008 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. | |
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MORGAN, DORIAN R. $5,727.57 PRINCIPAL, $268.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,995.57, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $268.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT MORGAN, DORIAN R. | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | POS: CMS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 HOURS | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-16-2008 CONTINUED TO AUG-15-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT MORGAN, DORIAN R. | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK SERVED FEB-12-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT MORGAN, DORIAN R. | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK AS TO DEFENDANT MORGAN, DORIAN R. DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-16-2008 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-14-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-01-2008 | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK |