Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LVNV FUNDING LLC VS. FUTURE M. HAYS et al
On December 13, 2007 a common counts/open book account/collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 13, 2007
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 8 months and 4 days
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FIL
C VS. FUTURE M. HAYS et al
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a proof of service document in a legal case between LVNV Funding LLC and Future M. Hays. The document provides details of the service of summons and other documents to the defendant. The service was carried out by M. Baber on be…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY LAVINSKY, IVAN S | |
December 10, 2008 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF DEC-10-2008, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. $1,969.39 PRINCIPAL, $268.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,237.39, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $268.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF IVAN S. LAVINSKY REGARDING UNAVAILABLITY OF ORIGINALS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF IVAN S. LAVINSKY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT FEES AND COSTS. FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC SERVED JUL-11-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, AS TO DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. | |
August 13, 2008 | hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-13-2008 CONTINUED TO DEC-10-2008 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE AUG-13-2008 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC SERVED JUL-11-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. | |
June 27, 2008 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-13-2008 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S). THE JUN-27-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT A NON JURY TRIAL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 HOURS | |
April 11, 2008 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT A NON-JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 HOURS | |
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-11-2008 CONTINUED TO JUN-27-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC AS TO DEFENDANT HAYS, FUTURE M. DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-11-2008 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-10-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-27-2008 | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY,IVAN LAVINSKY FILED BY PLAINTIFF LVNV FUNDING LLC |