Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT VS. GAR NG et al
On July 25, 2007 a common counts/open book account/collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 25, 2007
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10
Date: Oct 04, 2007NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Jul 25, 2007Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $2,159.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NG, GAR AN INDIVIDUAL | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $439.91 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT NG, GAR AN INDIVIDUAL | |
November 30, 2007 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF NOV-30-2007, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NG, GAR AN INDIVIDUAL $6,468.77 PRINCIPAL, $1,069.08 INTEREST, $219.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,756.85, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ( PLACED IN PICK-UP BOX ) | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10 | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT. FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE COMPUTATION OF PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST. FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PER 1033CCP(B) AND WAIVER OF COSTS THAT EXCEED $219 FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE WAIVER OF ATTY. FEES AND SECURITY INTEREST. FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, DISMISSAL OF DOES, DECLARATION OF PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST, 1033(B) AND COSTS, OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT, WAIVER OF ATTY. FEES AND SECURITY INTEREST. FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVED OCT-01-2007, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT NG, GAR AN INDIVIDUAL | |
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $219.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NG, GAR AN INDIVIDUAL | |
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVED AUG-15-2007, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT NG, GAR AN INDIVIDUAL | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT NG, GAR AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-30-2007 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-22-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-15-2007 | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |