Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PALISADES COLLECTION,LLC VS. FRANK BURE
On November 28, 2005 a common counts/open book account/collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 28, 2005
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
8 months and 10 days
Overview
Causes of Action
causes of action attached}:
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by Palisades Collection, LLC against Frank Bure. The case number is CGC-05-447050 and the filing date is November 28, 2005. The complaint alleges a breach of contract by Frank Bure. The amount demanded in …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND POS FILED BY PLTF | |
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED FILED BY PLAINTIFF PALISADES COLLECTION,LLC | |
March 30, 2006 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF MAR-30-2006, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PALISADES COLLECTION,LLC SERVED DEC-07-2005, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT BURE, FRANK | |
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PALISADES COLLECTION,LLC AS TO DEFENDANT BURE, FRANK SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-30-2006 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-27-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-15-2006 |