Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CO VS. THOMAS KENJI ROMANO et al
On July 14, 2005 a common counts/open book account/collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 14, 2005
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Sue M. Kaplan;Category
COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
11 months and 16 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
causes of action attached): “J Breach of Contract [Xx] Common Counts wna Other (specify):
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2006 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ROMANO, THOMAS KENJI IND. & DBA PROGRESS INTERNATIONAL/OCEAN BAY INTERNATIONAL | |
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $2,221.83 INTEREST, $106.00 COSTS, WITH MATURE DAY ON JUL-08-06 FILED BY PLAINTIFF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP | |
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT ROMANO, THOMAS KENJI IND. & DBA PROGRESS INTERNATIONAL/OCEAN BAY INTERNATIONAL | |
December 16, 2005 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP | |
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ROMANO, THOMAS KENJI IND. & DBA PROGRESS INTERNATIONAL/OCEAN BAY INTERNATIONAL | |
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-16-2005 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 22, 2005 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ROMANO, THOMAS KENJI IND. & DBA PROGRESS INTERNATIONAL/OCEAN BAY INTERNATIONAL $25,846.69 PRINCIPAL, $2,825.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $9,345.75 INTEREST, $325.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $38,342.94, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
November 22, 2005 | hearing |
Default Prove-Up In Scd.
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
November 22, 2005 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF NOV-22-2005, DEFAULT PROVE-UP IN SCD. GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. DEPT. 218, COMM. SUE KAPLAN, CLERK: S. RAVINANTAPRICHA, CSR: ARLENE HOWELL. | |
November 22, 2005 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR NOV-22-2005 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 218 | |
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP IN SCD. HEARING SET FOR NOV-22-2005 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 218 | |
September 30, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED FILED BY PLAINTIFF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP | |
September 30, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT ROMANO, THOMAS KENJI IND. & DBA PROGRESS INTERNATIONAL/OCEAN BAY INTERNATIONAL | |
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT & COMPLAINT [DECL OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED THERETO], PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP SERVED AUG-02-2005, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT ROMANO, THOMAS KENJI IND. & DBA PROGRESS INTERNATIONAL/OCEAN BAY INTERNATIONAL | |
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP AS TO DEFENDANT ROMANO, THOMAS KENJI IND. & DBA PROGRESS INTERNATIONAL/OCEAN BAY INTERNATIONAL DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-16-2005 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-12-2005 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-01-2005 |