Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Johnson Ruthena vs. Ramirez Victor
A 06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty E-File case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. Judge Charles S. Treat presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 28, 2024
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
06: Unlimited Breach of Contract/Warranty e-File
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Request
Date: Jan 17, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 17, 2024Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: Nov 08, 2023Declaration of
Date: Nov 08, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: Oct 26, 2023Proof of Service of Summons
Date: Oct 23, 2023Request Filed and Dismissal Entered as to All Remaining DOES
Date: Oct 23, 2023Initial Complaint Filed
Date: Aug 31, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 |
Hearing in Re:
Judge: Treat, Charles S |
||
January 25, 2024 | Notes | ||
January 17, 2024 |
Request for Continuance of Prove Up Hearing Request |
||
January 17, 2024 |
CMC Notice - Fast Track *Case Management Conference Judge: Treat, Charles S |
||
November 08, 2023 | Lodge Order/Judgment | ||
November 08, 2023 |
Declaration of Vrej Garabedian Re Atty Fees and Costs Declaration of |
||
November 08, 2023 | Notes | ||
November 08, 2023 | Declaration (CCP 585d) Filed | ||
November 08, 2023 | Request for Clerk/Court Judgment Filed | ||
November 07, 2023 | E-Filing Rejection | ||
October 26, 2023 |
Request to Enter Default Filed on Victor Ramirez Request to Enter Default Filed |
||
October 26, 2023 | Default entered as to: | ||
October 26, 2023 | E-Filing Rejection | ||
October 23, 2023 | Proof of Service of Summons | ||
October 23, 2023 | Request Filed and Dismissal Entered as to All Remaining DOES | ||
August 31, 2023 | Initial Complaint Filed | ||
August 31, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
August 31, 2023 | Service of Complaint and Summons | ||
August 31, 2023 | Original Summons Issued/Filed | ||
August 31, 2023 | Fee Paid |