Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jennifer Roberts vs. Johnie Ozzieh Edward Williams, Jr.
A 22: Unlimited Auto-Efile case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 21, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 27, 2024
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
22: Unlimited Auto-eFile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 19, 2024Notice of/to:
Date: Nov 13, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: Nov 13, 2023Summons Issued/Filed
Date: Jun 21, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Jun 21, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 |
Notice of Continuance & Reassignment *Case Management Conference Judge: Devine, John P |
||
November 13, 2023 |
Notice of Posting Jury Fees Recvd Notice of/to: |
||
November 13, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Jennifer Roberts Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
September 01, 2023 |
Request Filed and Partial Dismissal as to Sterling Logistics only Request Filed and Partial Dismissal Entered |
||
August 24, 2023 |
DOE 1 Amendment as naming FedEx Ground Package System, Inc DOE Amendment Filed |
||
July 07, 2023 | Notice of Change of Address | ||
June 21, 2023 | Summons Issued/Filed | ||
June 21, 2023 | Service of Complaint and Summons | ||
June 21, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
June 21, 2023 | Initial Complaint Filed | ||
June 21, 2023 | Fee Paid |