Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DENNIS BULLARD vs. APTIVE ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC
A 15: Unlimited Other Employment-Efile case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. Judge Charles S. Treat presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 21, 2023
Last Refreshed
June 23, 2024
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
15: Unlimited Other Employment-eFile
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Overview
Causes of Action
2 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION
5 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION Violation of California Labor Code §§ 226.7 and 512(a
20 THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION
21 FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION
14 FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION
1 SEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION
1 NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION
20 TENTH CAUSE OF ACTION
As to the First Cause of Action 8
As to the Sixth Cause of Action
As to the Ninth Cause of Action 11
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Amended Complaint Filed
Date: Oct 27, 2023Proof of Service
Date: Oct 24, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 20, 2023Proof of Service
Date: Oct 19, 2023Stipulation Filed Re:
Date: Oct 19, 2023Proof of Service
Date: Oct 13, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: Oct 13, 2023Notice of/to:
Date: Jul 27, 2023Notice of/to:
Date: Jul 20, 2023Proof of Service of Summons
Date: Jul 13, 2023Notice of/to:
Date: Jun 27, 2023Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: Jun 21, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Jun 21, 2023Initial Complaint Filed
Date: Jun 21, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | C23-01524 CASE NAME: DENNIS BULLARD VS. APTIVE ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: STAY PENDING APPEAL FILED BY: APTIVE ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC TENTATIVE RULING: This motion was previously conti... | |
June 06, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | C23-01524 CASE NAME: DENNIS BULLARD VS. APTIVE ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC HEARING ON DEMURRER TO: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY: APTIVE ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC TENTATIVE RULING: Due to scheduling constraints ... | |
February 29, 2024 |
*Hearing on Motion in Re:
Judge: Treat, Charles S |
||
February 29, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | C23-01524 CASE NAME: DENNIS BULLARD VS. APTIVE ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY: TENTATIVE RULING: In light of the denial of the arbitration motion (Line 10), the case... | |
February 21, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Treat, Charles S |
||
January 04, 2024 |
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Re Nicholas Orr for Aptive Enviromental Notice of/to: |
||
December 05, 2023 |
Amended Filing Re: Notice of Motion to Compel Arbitration Amended Filing Re: |
||
November 28, 2023 |
Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration Motion Filed To/For |
||
November 28, 2023 |
Proof of Service Re MTC Arbitration Proof of Service |
||
November 28, 2023 |
Declaration of Chet A. Kronenberg in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration Declaration of |
||
November 28, 2023 |
[Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration Lodge Order/Judgment |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Request Filed and Partial Dismissal Entered as to Def Aptive Environmental GP Request Filed and Partial Dismissal Entered |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Proof of Electronic Service Re Request for Dismissal as to Def Aptive Environmental GP only Proof of Electronic Service |
||
October 27, 2023 |
Pltfs 1st Amended Class Action Complaint Amended Complaint Filed |
||
October 27, 2023 | Notes | ||
October 27, 2023 |
Proof of Electronic Service Pltfs 1st Amended Class Action Complaint Proof of Electronic Service |
||
October 27, 2023 | Service of Amended Complaint | ||
October 24, 2023 |
Proof of Service Dismissal as to Aptive Enviromental GP only Proof of Service |
||
October 24, 2023 |
Request Filed and Partial Dismissal Entered as to Aptive Enviromental GP only Request Filed and Partial Dismissal Entered |
||
October 20, 2023 |
CMC Notice - Complex *Case Management Conference Judge: Treat, Charles S |
||
October 19, 2023 |
Proof of Service Re Stip Re Aptive Enviromental GP LLC Proof of Service |
||
October 19, 2023 |
Stip Re Aptive Enviromental GP, LLC Stipulation Filed Re: |
||
October 17, 2023 |
Notice of Remote Appearance for Nicholas R. Orr Notice of/to: |
||
October 13, 2023 |
Proof of Service Re Pltfs CMC Statment Proof of Service |
||
October 13, 2023 |
Case Management Statement filed by Aptive Environmental, LLC and Aptive Environmental GP, LLC Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
July 27, 2023 |
Notice of/to: Posting Jury Fees by Defendants Notice of/to: |
||
July 20, 2023 |
Notice of Appearance by Chet A. Kronenberg and Nicholas R. Orr for Def Notice of/to: |
||
July 13, 2023 |
Proof of Service of Summons on Aptive Enviromental LLC, A Utah Limited Liability company Proof of Service of Summons |
||
June 27, 2023 |
Notice of/to: Posting Jury Fees by Pltf Notice of/to: |
||
June 21, 2023 | Original Summons Issued/Filed | ||
June 21, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
June 21, 2023 | Initial Complaint Filed | ||
June 21, 2023 | Service of Complaint and Summons | ||
June 21, 2023 | Fee Paid |