Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Samim Aseem vs. FCA US LLC
A 06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty E-File case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. Judge John P. Devine presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 20, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 27, 2024
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
06: Unlimited Breach of Contract/Warranty e-File
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Devine, John P |
||
January 10, 2024 | Notice of Conditional Settlement of the Entire Case Filed | ||
October 20, 2023 |
Minutes *Case Management Conference Judge: Devine, John P |
||
October 05, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Samim Aseem Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
August 04, 2023 |
Proof of Service of Summons to FCA US LLC Proof of Service of Summons |
||
June 20, 2023 | Original Summons Issued/Filed | ||
June 20, 2023 | Service of Complaint and Summons | ||
June 20, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
June 20, 2023 | Initial Complaint Filed | ||
June 20, 2023 | Fee Paid |