Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FRANK GILLIS vs. CHARLES KAVANAUGH , Jr.
On January 31, 2023 a 23: unlimited other pi/pd/wd-efile case was filed in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. Judge Devine, John P presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 27, 2024
Filing Location
Contra Costa County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
23: Unlimited Other PI/PD/WD-eFile
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Frank Gillis against CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Charles W. Kavanaugh Jr., and Does 1 to 50. The complaint alleges general negligence and premises liability. It states that on or about February 26, 2021, Frank Gillis was lawful…...
Parties
Case Documents
Further Case Management Conference
Date: Oct 03, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: Sep 19, 2023Notice of/to:
Date: May 17, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Request
Date: Apr 10, 2023Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited
Date: Apr 03, 2023Proof of Service of Summons
Date: Mar 02, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Devine, John P |
||
January 23, 2024 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C. Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
January 22, 2024 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Frank Gillis Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
October 03, 2023 |
Minutes *Further Case Management Conference Judge: Devine, John P |
||
September 19, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Longs Drug Stores Ca erron sued as CVS Pharm, Inc. Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
September 18, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Frank Gillis Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
June 07, 2023 | Notice of Change of Address | ||
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes *Case Management Conference Judge: Devine, John P |
|
May 17, 2023 |
Notice of Posting Jury Fees Notice of/to: |
||
May 17, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by by Long's Drug Stores California, L.L.C. Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
May 15, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Frank Gilli Case Management Conference Statement Filed |
||
April 10, 2023 |
Request for statement of damages Request |
||
April 03, 2023 |
Answer From: Long's Drug Stores CA LLC, and Charles W. Kavanaugh, JR. Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited |
||
April 03, 2023 | Notes | ||
March 02, 2023 | Proof of Service of Summons | ||
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Summons Issued/Filed | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Service of Complaint and Summons | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Complaint Filed | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Fee Paid |