Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SUSAN WHITE VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL
On November 21, 2012 an other writ /judicial review (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Luis A. Lavin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 21, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Writ /Judicial Review (General Jurisdiction)
Case Outcome Type
Legacy Judgment
Status
Appealed
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER | |
November 30, 2016 | hearing |
Notice Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES ON APPEAL | |
October 31, 2016 | hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Hearing on Motion for Order - Held - Motion Granted |
|
October 27, 2016 | hearing |
Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Motion for Attorney's Fees ON APPEAL | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 13, 2016 | hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); County of Los Angeles District Attorney's (Defendant); County of Los Angeles, CEO, Risk Manage- (Defendant) |
|
August 24, 2016 | hearing |
Notice of Motion Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion for Attorney's Fees ON APPEAL; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH J. GIBBONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL | |
August 24, 2016 | hearing |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
July 25, 2016 | hearing |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL | |
August 19, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by Clerk |
|
June 26, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk |
|
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
June 05, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
June 04, 2014 | hearing |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL; NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ICRC 8.122]; NOTICE TO PREPARE REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT [CRC 8.130J; NOTICE THAT THIS APPEAL IS RELATED TO PRIOR APPEAL FILED ON FEBRUARY 21, 2014 FROM JUDGMENT IN THIS MATTER (THIS APPEAL RELATES T | |
May 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL | |
May 19, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS FEES AND ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS Motion to Tax Costs | |
May 13, 2014 | hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND TAXING $99.50 IN COSTS | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Motion to Tax Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; | |
May 06, 2014 | hearing |
Reply to Motion Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); Steve Cooley (Defendant); Dominick Rivetti (Defendant) et al. |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; DECLARATION OF AUDRA C. CALL IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
May 01, 2014 | hearing |
Objection Document Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
May 01, 2014 | hearing |
Reply to Motion Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS OBJECTION TO RESPONDENTS Request for Judicial Notice | |
April 30, 2014 | hearing |
Opposition Document Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
April 30, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS Motion to Tax Costs | |
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES | |
April 25, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL | |
April 24, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by Clerk |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
April 23, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CLARIFICATION OF DESIGNATION OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT (MADE A PART OF THE NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED FEBRUARY 20, 2014) | |
March 18, 2014 | hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); Steve Cooley (Defendant); Dominick Rivetti (Defendant) et al. |
|
February 24, 2014 | hearing |
Motion for an Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 21, 2014 | hearing |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL; NOTICE TO PREPARE CLERKS TRANSCRIPT, ETC | |
February 20, 2014 | hearing |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); Steve Cooley (Defendant); Dominick Rivetti (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 23, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Respondent |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE Motion to Tax Costs; | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE RE: WRIT OF MANDATE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1085 | |
January 16, 2014 | hearing |
Notice Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
January 08, 2014 | hearing |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 26, 2013 | hearing |
Receipt Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
December 24, 2013 | hearing |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 24, 2013 | hearing |
Writ issued Filed by Clerk |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT RE: PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT RE PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE SERVED BY MAIL ON DECEMBER 13, 2013 | |
December 23, 2013 | hearing |
Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF MANDATE | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Held - Motion Granted |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 03, 2013 | hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum of Points and Authorities ETC. | |
November 21, 2013 | hearing |
Reply to Motion Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DR. SEPIDEH SOURIS RE OPPOSITION TO Petition for Writ of Mandate | |
October 21, 2013 | hearing |
Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GEORGE MUELLER RE OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE | |
October 21, 2013 | hearing |
Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE RE OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice RE OPPOSITION TO Petition for Writ of Mandate | |
October 21, 2013 | hearing |
Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 21, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN OPPOSITION TO Petition for Writ of Mandate | |
September 24, 2013 | hearing |
Affidavit of Mailing Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
September 20, 2013 | hearing |
Declaration Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF AUDRA C. CALL IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF I MANDATE AND RELIEF PURSUANT TO COV. CODE SECTION 3309.5 | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND RELIEF PURSUANT TO GOV. CODE SECTION 3309.5 | |
September 20, 2013 | hearing |
Points and Authorities Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SUSAN M. WHITE IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND RELIEF PURSUANT TO COY. CODE SECTION 3309.5 | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Trial Setting Conference - Held |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON PETITIONERS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
April 16, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 85 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SUSAN WHITE | |
March 19, 2013 | hearing |
Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
March 13, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 82 Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Proceeding continued) - |
|
January 28, 2013 | hearing |
Notice Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE RE: FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND RELIEF PURSUANT TO GOV. CODE SECTION 3309.5 | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND RETURN TO FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE NOW ON APPEAL | |
January 28, 2013 | hearing |
Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE RE: PETITIONERS VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS | |
December 17, 2012 | hearing |
Notice Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND RELIEF PURSUANT TO GOV. CODE SECTION 3309.5 | |
December 07, 2012 | hearing |
Amended Petition Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | NOIICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & 4-TTACHED ORDERS THEREON | |
December 07, 2012 | hearing |
Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Susan White (Plaintiff) |
|
November 27, 2012 | hearing |
Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | VERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND RELIEF PURSUANT TO GOV. CODE SECTION 3309.5 | |
November 21, 2012 | hearing |
Petition Filed by null |