Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RICHARD ZERBEL ET AL VS ABRAHAM VORSTER
On December 18, 2006 a civil harassment (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Civil Harassment (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Case Outcome Type
Other Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
30 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 76, Richard E\. Rico, Presiding Hrng on Petn Prohibit Harassment (TRO IN EFFECT) - TRO dism before evid by both sided Judge: Richard E. Rico |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 76, Richard E\. Rico, Presiding Hrng on Petn Prohibit Harassment (TRO IN EFFECT) - Not Held-Continued Judge: Richard E. Rico |
|
January 05, 2007 | hearing |
Response to Harrassment Petition Filed by Respondent |
|
January 05, 2007 | hearing |
Proof-Personal Service Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 18, 2006 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Request |