Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BOOTH, DIANE - CONSERVATORSHIP
On May 29, 2015 a conservatorship (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Maria E. Stratton presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Death (Notification of Death of Conservatee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Death (Notification of Death of Conservatee ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator Neurocognitive Cons'r Report | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of court investigation report ) Filed by Court |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of court investigation report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator Neurocognitive Cons'r Report | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigator Report ) Filed by Court |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigator Report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigator Report ) Filed by Probate Investigator |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Probate Investigator |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document (Letter to: Judge Maria E. Stratton Filed By: Henning, Linda, Real Party in Interest ) | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document (Letter to: Judge Maria E. Stratton Filed By: Henning, Linda, Real Party in Interest ) | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice (CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice (CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Conservator (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Conservator: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook (Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook (Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Conservator (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Conservator: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed by: Court ) | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed by: Court ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment - Held Appointment - Held Judge: Stratton Maria E. |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment - Held Judge: Maria E. |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof - Mailing (Filed by: Clerk ) | |
September 10, 2015 | Proof of Service - Probate Investigator | ||
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof - Mailing (Filed by: Clerk ) | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Filed By: Grossmann, Steven G., Esq., PVP Attorney ) | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Filed By: Grossmann, Steven G., Esq., PVP Attorney ) | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 08, 2015 | Citation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service | ||
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint Conservator of P & E (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 ) | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint Conservator of P & E (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 09/11/2015 Filed By: Booth, John M., Petitioner Repres By: Salvo, Alice A., Attorney At Law, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 ) | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment - Held - Continued Appointment - Held - Continued Judge: Stratton Maria E. |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment - Held - Continued Judge: Maria E. |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Filed by: PVP Attorney ) | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Filed by: PVP Attorney ) | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel (Steven Grossman Filed by: Court ) | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel (Steven Grossman Filed by: Court ) | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Public Guardian ) | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Public Guardian ) | |
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Doctor's Capacity Declaration (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Doctor's Capacity Declaration (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 11, 2015 | Citation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service | ||
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint Conservator of P & E (Judgment by Court-Petition Denied After Trial - Contested 1st Hearing Date: Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint Conservator of P & E (Judgment by Court-Petition Denied After Trial - Contested 1st Hearing Date: 07/17/2015 Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Ambrosio, Denise, County Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) |