Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LEVY, CHERYL - CONSERVATORSHIP
On May 29, 2015 a conservatorship (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Roy L. Paul presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator Neurocognitive Cons'r Report | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Mail - Certificate of Mailing | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator General/Limited Cons'r Review Report | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail - Certificate of Mailing | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator Neurocognitive Cons'r Report | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of court investigation report ) Filed by Court |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of court investigation report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of court investigation report ) Filed by Court |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Report - Court Investigator | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held Court Order Hearing - Held Judge: Small Michael |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held Judge: Michael |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order - Approving Account | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Small Michael |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Michael |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Small Michael |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Michael |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Conservatorship/Guardianship (SECOND ACCOUNT CURRENT, REPORT OF CONSERVATOR, PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, FOR APPROVAL OF CONSERVATOR'S AND ATTORNEY'S COMPENSATION, AND WAIVER OF FUTURE ACCOUNTS ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Conservatorship/Guardianship (SECOND ACCOUNT CURRENT, REPORT OF CONSERVATOR, PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, FOR APPROVAL OF CONSERVATOR'S AND ATTORNEY'S COMPENSATION, AND WAIVER OF FUTURE ACCOUNTS ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Conservatorship/Guardianship (SECOND ACCOUNT CURRENT, REPORT OF CONSERVATOR, PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, FOR APPROVAL OF CONSERVATOR'S AND ATTORNEY'S COMPENSATION, AND WAIVER OF FUTURE ACCOUNTS ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Lippitt Elizabeth A. |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Elizabeth A. |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of Court Investigation Report, sent to Public Guardian and County Counsel ) Filed by Court |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of Court Investigation Report, sent to Public Guardian and County Counsel ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (of Court Investigation Report, sent to Public Guardian and County Counsel ) Filed by Court |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Order - Approving Account | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Paul, Roy L., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Paul Roy L. |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Paul, Roy L., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Roy L. |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Paul, Roy L., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Paul Roy L. |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Paul, Roy L., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Roy L. |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Conservatorship/Guardianship Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Conservatorship/Guardianship Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Stratton Maria E. |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Maria E. |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Fee Waiver Tally Sheet ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Fee Waiver Tally Sheet ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Fee Waiver Tally Sheet ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed by: PVP Attorney ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (Filed by: PVP Attorney ) | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document (DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Document (DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice (CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice (CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (Declaration of urgency Filed by: Public Administrator ) | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Conservator (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Conservator (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (Declaration of urgency Filed by: Public Administrator ) | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment - Held Appointment - Held Judge: Stratton Maria E. |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment - Held Judge: Maria E. |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 15, 2015 | Citation for Conservatorship and Proof of Service | ||
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held Appointment Hearing - Temp Guardianship - Held Judge: Stratton Maria E. |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temporary - Held Judge: Maria E. |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Filed By: Gilder, Mark H., Attorney at Law, PVP Attorney ) | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Report - Court Appointed Counsel (Filed By: Gilder, Mark H., Attorney at Law, PVP Attorney ) | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel (MARK H. GILDER Filed By: SUPERIOR COURT, Court ) | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel (MARK H. GILDER Filed By: SUPERIOR COURT, Court ) | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner ) | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner ) | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent) (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 ) | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent) (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 06/09/2015 Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint Conservator of P & E (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Appoint Conservator of P & E (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 07/17/2015 Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN, Petitioner Repres By: Jines, Mary W., Principal Deputy Counsel, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) |