Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SCHOTT, MARGO MARIE - DECEDENT
On May 29, 2015 a decedent's estate (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Clifford L. Klein presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Decedent's Estate (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Klein Clifford |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Clifford |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. (Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. (Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. (Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Klein Clifford |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Clifford |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order (Order After Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order (Order After Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order (Order After Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Attorney for Petitioner |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Re: CITATION RE OSC/Party Served By Mail: Kathrine Stapleton, Esq. ) Filed by Court |
|
October 23, 2017 | Proof of Service - Re: CITATION RE OSC/Party Served By Mail: Kathrine Stapleton, Esq. | ||
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Re: CITATION RE OSC/Party Served By Mail: Kathrine Stapleton, Esq. ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Attorney for Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Petitioner |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Re: CITATION RE OSC/Party Served By Mail: Kathrine Stapleton, Esq. ) Filed by Court |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Klein Clifford |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Clifford |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Klein Clifford |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Clifford |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver - (No Fee) (Waiver ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supplement (First and Final Report, Waiver of Account ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (First and Fianl Report, Waiver of Account, Waiver of Compensation, Fees, Reimbursement, Final Distribution ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (First and Fianl Report, Waiver of Account, Waiver of Compensation, Fees, Reimbursement, Final Distribution ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supplement (First and Final Report, Waiver of Account ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver - (No Fee) (Waiver ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (First and Fianl Report, Waiver of Account, Waiver of Compensation, Fees, Reimbursement, Final Distribution ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supplement (First and Final Report, Waiver of Account ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver - (No Fee) (Waiver ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal - Special Notice Filed by Probate Referee |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal - Special Notice Filed by Probate Referee Filed by Probate Referee |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request - Special Notice (No Fee) Filed by Probate Referee |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request - Special Notice (No Fee) Filed by Probate Referee Filed by Probate Referee |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request - Special Notice (No Fee) Filed by Probate Referee |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Klein Clifford |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Clifford |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: House Mary Thornton |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Mary Thornton |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Final ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Account - Final or Waiver (First and Final Report of Executor on Waiver of Account and Petitions ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Final ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Account - Final or Waiver (First and Final Report of Executor on Waiver of Account and Petitions ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Account - Final or Waiver (First and Final Report of Executor on Waiver of Account and Petitions ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Final ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: House Mary Thornton |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Mary Thornton |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Court |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Attorney |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 17, 2017 | Proof of Service | ||
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Attorney Filed by Attorney |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: House Mary Thornton |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Mary Thornton |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Administration to Creditors (Filed By: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Administration to Creditors (Filed By: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed by: Attorney for Executor Issued To:: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed By: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters (Filed by: Attorney for Executor Issued To:: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed By: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Will (Will Admitted 2015-07-01 Filed by: Petitioner ) | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Murphy, Daniel S., Presiding Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held Judge: Murphy Daniel S. |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Will (Will Admitted 2015-07-01 Filed by: Petitioner ) | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Murphy, Daniel S., Presiding Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held Judge: Daniel S. |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (PUBLICATION Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration (PUBLICATION Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: Filed By: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 07/01/2015 Filed By: Zamel, Juliet Ann, Petitioner Repres By: Stapleton, Kevin, Law Offices of, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) |