Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JUE, HOWARD C. - DECEDENT
On August 19, 2014 a decedent's estate (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Lesley C. Green presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Klein Clifford;Category
Decedent's Estate (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Order (Order on Waiver of First and Final Account, etc. ) | |
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Order (Order on Waiver of First and Final Account, etc. ) | |
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Probate Department Return Document re: Proposed Order ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Probate Department Return Document re: Proposed Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Subsequent Document Filing Coversheet ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Subsequent Document Filing Coversheet ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Green Lesley C. |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Lesley C. |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supplement (First To Waiver Of First And Final Account, Etc.. ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supplement (First To Waiver Of First And Final Account, Etc.. ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Green Lesley C. |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Lesley C. |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Account - Final or Waiver (Waiver of First and Final Accnt. and Report ..... ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Account - Final or Waiver (Waiver of First and Final Accnt. and Report ..... ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Final ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal (Final ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Status Report Hearing - Held Status Report Hearing - Held Judge: Green Lesley C. |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding Status Report Hearing - Held Judge: Lesley C. |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Report of Status of Administration ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Report of Status of Administration ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Report of Personal Representative Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Report of Personal Representative Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal (Filed by: Attorney for Administrator ) | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal (Filed by: Attorney for Administrator ) | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee (R HUTCHINSON Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee (R HUTCHINSON Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Letters (Full Authority Filed by: Attorney for Administrator Issued To:: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Letters (Full Authority Filed by: Attorney for Administrator Issued To:: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Probate (Full Authority NO BOND Filed by: Attorney for Administrator Administrato: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Waiver - (No Fee) (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Probate (Full Authority NO BOND Filed by: Attorney for Administrator Administrato: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Waiver - (No Fee) (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Will (Admitted per order ) | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held Judge: Klein Clifford |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held Judge: Clifford |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Will (Admitted per order ) | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplement (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplement (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration (MAY W. YEE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration (HELEN C. JUE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Nomination (MAY W. YEE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration (EDWIN C. JUE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (YEE, MELODEE A. ACT AS ADMINISTRATOR Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (YEE, MELODEE A. ACT AS ADMINISTRATOR Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration (EDWIN C. JUE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Nomination (MAY W. YEE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration (MAY W. YEE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration (HELEN C. JUE Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (AMENDED Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (AMENDED Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held - Continued Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Klein Clifford |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 11, Klein, Clifford, Presiding Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Clifford |
|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent) (First Amended ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent) (First Amended ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 09/23/2014 Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Filed By: Yee, Melodee A., Petitioner Repres By: Schwartz, Robert D., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner ) |