Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TELMA AZUCENA COREA MARTIN VS CESAR ARMANDO MARTIN BONOZO
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Martin Telma Azucena Corea, against Bonozo Cesar Armando Martin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
7 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martin, Telma ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martin, Telma ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-17-15 ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (FL140 Personal - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martin, Telma ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 08-20-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martin, Telma - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martin, Telma ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martin, Telma ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Martin, Telma ) Filed by Petitioner |