Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARIA DE SOCORRO GARCIA VS ELFEGO PERULERO CORDERO
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Garcia Maria De Socorro, represented by Politiski Richard James, against Cordero Elfego Perulero, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 04, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
7 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-15 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-15 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (pet - Service Date on 2015-05-30 ) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (waived-resp ) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (resp - Service Date on 2015-07-16 ) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (pet-waive ) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (pet-waive ) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (pet - Service Date on 2015-05-30 ) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (resp - Service Date on 2015-07-16 ) | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (waived-resp ) | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (RECEIVED ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (RECEIVED ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL ) | |
May 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
May 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Garcia, Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |