Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOSE PEDRO ROMAN ARIAS VS SHEYNA VERONICA ROMAN
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Arias Jose Pedro Roman, against Roman Sheyna Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
6 months and 17 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Income and Expense (RECEIVED ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (RECEIVED ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (RECEIVED ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Income and Expense (RECEIVED ) | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL ) | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 07-30-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Arias, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |