Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LENNOX S ROWLAND VS GLENDER L GREEN
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Rowland Lennox S., against Green Glender L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Maren E. Nelson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 02, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Relief Denied
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-26-16 ) | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-26-16 ) | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Held - Order Made Workshop - Held - Order Made |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Held - Order Made |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-24-16 ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-24-16 ) | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (personal - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Off Calendar - No Appearance Workshop - Off Calendar - No Appearance |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Off Calendar - No Appearance |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (personal - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-17-16 ) | |
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-17-16 ) | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Held - Order Made Workshop - Held - Order Made |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 1:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Held - Order Made |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order - Publication (POSTING - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox - Denied on 2015-12-04 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order - Publication (POSTING - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox - Denied on 2015-12-04 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application - Publication/Posting of Summons (- Denied on 2015-12-04 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application - Publication/Posting of Summons (- Denied on 2015-12-04 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Nelson, Maren, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Nelson Maren |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Nelson, Maren, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Maren |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-03-15 ) | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-03-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rowland, Lennox ) Filed by Petitioner |