Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SHU CHUN WU VS SHA LI TAN
On April 08, 2014 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Wu Shu Chun, against Tan Sha Li, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 08, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
4 months and 19 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Child Support Case Registry Form Received | |
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Establish or Modify Child Support and Order | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Respondent: Tan, Sha ) Filed by Respondent |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wu, Shu ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- Signed on 2014-04-12 ) | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (Mail & NOAR ) | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 07-31-14 ) | |
April 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-12-14 ) | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wu, Shu ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wu, Shu ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wu, Shu ) Filed by Petitioner |