Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ZHONG BIN QIN VS LIANXIU MO
On April 08, 2014 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Qin Zhong Bin, against Mo Lianxiu, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Scott M. Gordon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 08, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 14, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- Rejected on 2015-10-07 ) | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 (- Rejected on 2015-10-07 ) | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- Rejected on 2015-10-07 ) | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default FL170 (- Rejected on 2015-10-07 ) | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 08-06-15 ) | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 08-06-15 ) | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (incomplete and incorrect ) | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (incomplete and incorrect ) | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Off Calendar - No Appearance Workshop - Off Calendar - No Appearance |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
at 1:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Room 426 Workshop - Off Calendar - No Appearance |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (SOLO ) | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-25-14 ) | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (personal ) | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (SOLO ) | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-25-14 ) | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (personal ) | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (PET'S NAME DIFF - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (PET'S NAME DIFF - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Gordon, Scott M., Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Gordon Scott M. |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2A, Gordon, Scott M., Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Scott M. |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (INCOMPLETE ) | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (POS Incomplete/Caption reversed ) | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Enter Default FL165 (POS Incomplete/Caption reversed ) | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons (INCOMPLETE ) | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 07-17-14 ) | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 07-17-14 ) | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-25-14 ) | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (PET NAME DIFF/INVALID SERV - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-25-14 ) PROCEEDINGS HELD | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-25-14 ) | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (PET NAME DIFF/INVALID SERV - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Qin, Zhong ) Filed by Petitioner |