Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MALIK VS JIM M. HERRING (DECEASED) ET AL
A 26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 19, 2024
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of California
Category
26-CV Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
(ADVERSE POSSESSION
AND
DECLARATION OF RONALD D.
DESSY RE DEATHS OF JIM M.
HERRING AND MODELL HERRING
(Cal. Code Civ. Proc. § 762.030
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Conference
Date: Jul 16, 202451324 RED Malik v Herring
Date: May 13, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 02, 2024RED Malik v Herring
Date: May 01, 2024POS DOES 1 -10 inclusive re Malik v Herring
Date: Mar 21, 2024POS APU er Malik v Herring
Date: Mar 21, 2024POS TI Modell H re Malik v Herring
Date: Mar 21, 2024POS re Modell Herring deceased re Malik v Herring
Date: Mar 21, 2024POS TI Jim H re Malik v Herring
Date: Mar 21, 2024POS Jim M Herring deceased re Malik v Herring
Date: Mar 21, 2024Filing of Recorded Copy of Notice of Pendency of Action Malik v Herring
Date: Mar 01, 2024Exparte Application for Order for Publication of Summons Malik v Herring
Date: Feb 05, 2024Order for Publication of Summons Malik v Herring et al
Date: Feb 05, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: Jan 18, 2024Complaint Malik v Herring
Date: Jan 18, 2024CCCS Malik v Herring
Date: Jan 18, 2024Summons Malik v Herring
Date: Jan 18, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2024 | hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 51324 RED Malik v Herring | |
May 02, 2024 | hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 01, 2024 | hearing |
Request For Entry of Default Not Entered 1a ; 1b incomplete ; 6a Does are not part of the case until they are named. |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request For Entry of Default Not Entered 1a ; 1b incomplete ; 6a Does are not part of the case until they are named. |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | RED Malik v Herring | |
April 02, 2024 | hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service-DOES 1-10 |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service-DOES 1-10 |
|
March 21, 2024 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to and all persons unknown, claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate lien, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to Plaintiff's title, or ay cloud on Plaintiff's title thereto via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to the testate and intestate successors of Modell Herring, and all persons claiming by, through, or under Model Herring via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Modell Herring (deceased) via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to the testate and intestate successors of Jim M. Herring, and all persons claiming by, through, or under Jim M Herring via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Jim M Herring (deceased) via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to the testate and intestate successors of Modell Herring, and all persons claiming by, through, or under Model Herring via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Modell Herring (deceased) via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to the testate and intestate successors of Jim M. Herring, and all persons claiming by, through, or under Jim M Herring via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to and all persons unknown, claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate lien, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to Plaintiff's title, or ay cloud on Plaintiff's title thereto via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Jim M Herring (deceased) via publication |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | POS DOES 1 -10 inclusive re Malik v Herring | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | POS APU er Malik v Herring | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | POS TI Modell H re Malik v Herring | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | POS re Modell Herring deceased re Malik v Herring | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | POS TI Jim H re Malik v Herring | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | POS Jim M Herring deceased re Malik v Herring | |
March 01, 2024 | hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing Filing of Recorded Copy of Notice of Pendency of Action |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Filing of Recorded Copy of Notice of Pendency of Action |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Filing of Recorded Copy of Notice of Pendency of Action Malik v Herring | |
February 09, 2024 | hearing |
Order for Publication of Summons Order on Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for Publication of Summons Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication of Summons Order on Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for Publication of Summons |
|
February 05, 2024 | hearing | Application for Publication of Summons | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Exparte Application for Order for Publication of Summons Malik v Herring | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Order for Publication of Summons Malik v Herring et al | |
January 18, 2024 | hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
January 18, 2024 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/02/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H |
|
January 18, 2024 | hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
January 18, 2024 | hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
January 18, 2024 | hearing | Complaint | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/02/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint Malik v Herring | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CCCS Malik v Herring | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Malik v Herring |