Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BUSH VS HITCHCOCK AUTO PARTS INC. ET AL
A case was filed by Andy Bush, against Sergio Antonio Camacho Samano, and Hitchcock Auto Parts Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2022
Last Refreshed
June 19, 2023
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/6/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: HRe: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/6/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: H |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
December 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |