Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP VS CAMARENA
Small Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months case was filed by Oportun Inc Fka Progress Financial Corp, against Camarena, Anai Perez, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 18, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
Small Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
5 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2017 | hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) SC-133 SENT TO DEFENDANT |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) SC-133 SENT TO DEFENDANT |
|
May 03, 2017 | hearing |
Contract CANCELLED |
|
May 03, 2017 | hearing |
Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) AS TO DIANA CHAVARRIA FOR OPORTUN INC |
|
May 03, 2017 | hearing |
Small Claims Trial Cont'd from 02/22/17. Amount $1,010.43 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Contract CANCELLED |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial 05/03/2017 Small Claims Trial Cont'd from 02/22/17. Amount $1,010.43 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) AS TO DIANA CHAVARRIA FOR OPORTUN INC |
|
February 22, 2017 | hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Holladay, Brandon |
|
December 06, 2016 | hearing |
Proof of Service AS TO ANAI PEREZ CAMARENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE. RETURNED VIA ABC |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AS TO ANAI PEREZ CAMARENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE. RETURNED VIA ABC |
|
November 18, 2016 | hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
November 18, 2016 | hearing |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant RETURNED VIA SASE |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant RETURNED VIA SASE |