Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOEL ROTHSCHILD VS B DADDY INTEREST INC ET AL
On July 27, 2018 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 27, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Unknown disposition
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 27 days
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
CI TSCASE s BCT LEAS
LEASDEFH:
RECEIFT #: CCHSCES 76073
DATE PAID: OF F271 12:07 Pa
PAYMENT : $435.00 31g
RECEIVED:
CHECK + $435.00
CASH: $0.0)
CHANGE : $000
CARD: $0.00
NUE
hschild” or “Plaintiff’) is an adult residing in
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Laura A. Seigle |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Laura A. Seigle |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Laura A. Seigle |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Laura A. Seigle |
|
December 23, 2019 | Request for Dismissal | ||
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Joel Rothschild (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2019 | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO | ||
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Joel Rothschild (Plaintiff) |
|
July 31, 2019 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by B Daddy Interest, Inc. (Defendant); Bradley Bayou (Defendant) |
|
March 01, 2019 | Answer | ||
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by B Daddy Interest, Inc. (Defendant); Bradley Bayou (Defendant) |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by B Daddy Interest, Inc. (Defendant); Bradley Bayou (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2019 | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt | ||
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Joel Rothschild (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Joel Rothschild (Plaintiff) |
|
July 27, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT | ||
July 27, 2018 | SUMMONS - | ||
July 27, 2018 | COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | ||
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Joel Rothschild (Plaintiff) |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT |