Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CATALYST RESOURCE GROUP INC VS ST FRANCIS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
On March 01, 2018 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 01, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 months and 16 days
Overview
Causes of Action
VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR:
() BREACH OF CONTRACT;
(Il) ANTICIPATORY BREACH OF
CONTRACT;
(111) BREACH OF IMPLIED
COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH
AND FAIR DEALING; AND
(IV) DECLARATORY RELIEF
Pursuant to CCP § 1060
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 48 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Elizabeth Allen White 8:30 am | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00 | |
August 14, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 48 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
July 16, 2018 | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ST. FRANCIS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF HAWAII'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMOINS AND DISMISS COMPLAINT | ||
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 137 Days | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ST. FRANCIS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF HAWAII'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMOINS AND DISMISS COMPLAINT | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
June 27, 2018 | NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT ST. FRANCIS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF HAWAII'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS COMPLAINT | ||
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT ST. FRANCIS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF HAWAII'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS COMPLAINT | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by St. Francis Healthcare System of Hawaii (Defendant) Filed by St. Francis Healthcare System of Hawaii (Defendant) |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by St. Francis Healthcare System of Hawaii (Defendant) |
|
June 26, 2018 | RULING | ||
June 26, 2018 | Minute Order - | ||
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion to Quash Elizabeth Allen White 8:30 am | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | RULING | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00 | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 48 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
June 26, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 48 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 17, 2018 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion to Quash Elizabeth Allen White | |
April 12, 2018 | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS COMPLAINT; DECLARATIONS OF KEVIN NISHIDA AND JERRY CORREA IN SUPPORT | ||
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS COMPLAINT; DECLARATIONS OF KEVIN NISHIDA AND JERRY CORREA IN SUPPORT | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Filed by St. Francis Healthcare System of Hawaii (Defendant) Filed by St. Francis Healthcare System of Hawaii (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Filed by St. Francis Healthcare System of Hawaii (Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Catalyst Resource Group Inc (Plaintiff) Filed by Catalyst Resource Group Inc (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Catalyst Resource Group Inc (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
March 09, 2018 | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS - | ||
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
March 01, 2018 | VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: (I) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC. | ||
March 01, 2018 | SUMMONS - | ||
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: (I) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC. | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Catalyst Resource Group Inc (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Catalyst Resource Group Inc (Plaintiff) |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Catalyst Resource Group Inc (Plaintiff) |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: (I) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC. |