Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THOMAS M LEE VS LIRAN JAKOB ROSENFELD
On February 01, 2018 an other non-personal injury/property damage tort (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 01, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 26, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage tort (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 28 days
Overview
Causes of Action
FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR
DAMAGES:
1) VIOLATION OF THE IMMIGRATION
CONSULTANT ACT;
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 28 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 24, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 28 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
April 30, 2018 | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - | ||
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Thomas M. Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 20, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 28 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Continued by Court) - |
|
April 05, 2018 | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | ||
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
March 22, 2018 | FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) VIOLATION OF THE IMMIGRATION CONSULTANT ACT | ||
March 22, 2018 | hearing | FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) VIOLATION OF THE IMMIGRATION CONSULTANT ACT | |
March 22, 2018 | hearing |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Thomas M. Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
March 09, 2018 | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF LIRAN J. ROSENFELD DEMURRER | ||
March 09, 2018 | DEFENDANT LIRAN J. ROSENFELD NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT | ||
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF LIRAN J. ROSENFELD DEMURRER | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT LIRAN J. ROSENFELD NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Points and Authorities Filed by Liran Jakob Rosenfeld (Defendant) |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed by Liran Jakob Rosenfeld (Defendant) |
|
February 26, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
February 14, 2018 | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT | ||
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Thomas M. Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
February 13, 2018 | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | ||
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Thomas M. Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
February 07, 2018 | Minute Order - | ||
February 07, 2018 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE) | ||
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 07, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 55 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
February 05, 2018 | PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6) | ||
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Thomas M. Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6) | |
February 01, 2018 | SUMMONS - | ||
February 01, 2018 | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) VIOLATION OF THE IMMIGRATION CONSULTANT ACT; ETC | ||
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
February 01, 2018 | hearing | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) VIOLATION OF THE IMMIGRATION CONSULTANT ACT; ETC | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Thomas M. Lee (Plaintiff) |
|