Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KENNETH YING VS NORBERTO LAZCANO BERNAL
On January 09, 2018 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 09, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Other Court-Ordered Dismissal
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Christopher K. Lui |
|
July 09, 2019 | hearing |
in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Christopher K. Lui |
|
June 25, 2019 | hearing |
in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Christopher K. Lui |
|
March 07, 2019 | Request for Dismissal | ||
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Kenneth Ying (Plaintiff) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Kenneth Ying (Plaintiff) |
|
June 04, 2018 | CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE RE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NORBERTO LAICANO BERNAL TO PLAINTIFF KENNETH YING'S COMPLAINT | ||
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE RE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NORBERTO LAICANO BERNAL TO PLAINTIFF KENNETH YING'S COMPLAINT | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Norberto Lazcano Bernal (Defendant) |
|
May 18, 2018 | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NORBERTO LAZCANO BERNAL TO PLAINTIFF KENNETH YING'S COMPLAINT | ||
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Norberto Lazcano Bernal (Defendant) |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NORBERTO LAZCANO BERNAL TO PLAINTIFF KENNETH YING'S COMPLAINT | |
May 15, 2018 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service - | ||
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Kenneth Ying (Plaintiff) |
|
January 09, 2018 | Summons - | ||
January 09, 2018 | Complaint - | ||
January 09, 2018 | CoverSheet - | ||
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Kenneth Ying (Plaintiff) |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Kenneth Ying (Plaintiff) |
|