Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VERITEXT CORP VS MEYER LAW ORGANIZATION LLC
On October 11, 2017 a contract/warranty breach - seller plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 11, 2017
Last Refreshed
October 07, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Clerk
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
5 months and 0 days
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR MONEY
1 GOODS AND SERVICES SOLD AND DELIVERED
2 ACCOUNT STATED
OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT
BREACH OF CONTRACT -
UNIFORM COMMERCIAL CODE
Action Filed.
Trial Date
RIVA
mos me
o9240 aa
memm a
mo
agoamara NH
Bm
fea
aoa
an x
aea
ne
no
eo
a
on
oFwe
ao
“le S2oa
as
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Status Conference - Held |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY STATEMENT | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by VERITEXT CORP. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 14, 2017 | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS - | ||
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by VERITEXT CORP. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 11, 2017 | COMPLAINT FOR MONEY: 1. GOODS AND SERVJCES SOLD AND DELIVERED ;ETC | ||
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by VERITEXT CORP. (Plaintiff) |
|