Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
INTEGRATED MECHANICAL SYSTEMS INC VS JORGENSEN-REEVE BUILDER
On June 22, 2016 an other breach of contract/warranty (not fraud or negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 22, 2016
Last Refreshed
August 20, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
7 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Integrated Mechanical Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) - |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRECTED NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE AND STAY OF DEPOSITIONS | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE AND STAY OF DEPOSITIONS | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by SOHO House West Hollywood, LLC (Defendant) |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Status Conference (Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 30 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASES | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by SOHO House West Hollywood, LLC (Defendant) |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 (Order ReRelated Cases; Court makes order) - |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 01, 2016 | DEFENDANT SOHO HOUSE WEST HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF INTEGRATED MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INC. | ||
September 01, 2016 | SOHO HOUSE WEST HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1) IMPLIED CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITY; ETC | ||
September 01, 2016 | SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT | ||
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | SOHO HOUSE WEST HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1) IMPLIED CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITY; ETC | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by SOHO House West Hollywood, LLC (Defendant) |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT SOHO HOUSE WEST HOLLYWOOD, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF INTEGRATED MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INC. | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2016 | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS - | ||
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Integrated Mechanical Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROCEEDINGS | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-CONTRACT | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Integrated Mechanical Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |