Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
YUE FEN HONG ET AL VS MICHAEL ERIC FISHER JR ET AL
On June 22, 2016 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 22, 2016
Last Refreshed
August 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year and 7 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Yue Fen Hong (Plaintiff); Jingen Zhu (Legacy Party) |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
February 07, 2017 | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS - | ||
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Yue Fen Hong (Plaintiff) |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Yue Fen Hong (Plaintiff) |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Clerk |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Filed by Clerk |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC. | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Yue Fen Hong (Plaintiff) |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) |