Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KIA SAIDNIA GABBAY VS EMANUELE GIANINI
On June 22, 2016 a premise liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 22, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Jury Verdict
Case Duration
1 year and 6 months
Overview
Causes of Action
ENDMENT TO COMPLAINT uo (Er VSSNS
BC624543
{Fictitious /Incorrect Name)
D-q\
Z]
the plaintiff, being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having
omplaint by the fictitious name of:
LQ
me of the defendant to be:
an Individual
ing the true name for the fictitious Aame wherever it Appears|in the complaint.
TYPE OR PRINT NAME, wee Tene /
Omid Razi, Esq
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00 | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 548 Days | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Patricia D\. Nieto 8:30 am | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 91 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 91 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00 | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Patricia D\. Nieto 10:00 am | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 91 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 91 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Rq for Determ of Good Faith Setlmt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION; ETC | |
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 17, 2017 | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | ||
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 04, 2017 | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS - | ||
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 10, 2017 | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT - | ||
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 27, 2016 | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT EMANUELE GIANINI TO PLAINTIFF KIA SAIDNIA GABBAY'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT | ||
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) |
|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT EMANUELE GIANINI TO PLAINTIFF KIA SAIDNIA GABBAY'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Emanuele (Good Faith) Gianini (Defendant) |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 01, 2016 | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS - | ||
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
June 23, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Final Status Conference Patricia D\. Nieto | |
June 23, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Patricia D\. Nieto | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall) | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Kia Saidnia Gabbay (Plaintiff) |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) |