Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
REINE BILGRAI VS JESSIE TOVAR
On June 02, 2016 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 02, 2016
Last Refreshed
August 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Unknown Event Type |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) - |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
April 12, 2017 | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | ||
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Jessie Tovar (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Jessie Tovar (Defendant) |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
December 21, 2016 | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS - | ||
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Reine Bilgrai (Plaintiff) |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Reine Bilgrai (Plaintiff) |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NON SERVICE REPORT | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Reine Bilgrai (Plaintiff) |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NON SERVICE REPORT | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NON SERVICE REPORT | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Service - Other Filed by Reine Bilgrai (Plaintiff) |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Reine Bilgrai (Plaintiff) |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Reine Bilgrai (Plaintiff) |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Reine Bilgrai (Plaintiff) |
|