Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OREGON MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS GEVORK DZHANOYAN
On June 02, 2016 an uninsured motorist (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 02, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Burbank Courthouse
Category
Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
6 months and 19 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt (ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; ABC ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt (ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; ABC ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt (ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; ABC ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 04, 2017 | hearing |
in Department 97 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
November 16, 2017 | hearing |
in Department 97 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt (REJECTED-#4 INCOMPLETE-DID THE COURT ORDER THAT THE JUDGMENT BE PAID IN INSTALLMENTS-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; TELLO'S ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt (REJECTED-#4 INCOMPLETE-DID THE COURT ORDER THAT THE JUDGMENT BE PAID IN INSTALLMENTS-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; TELLO'S ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt (REJECTED-#4 INCOMPLETE-DID THE COURT ORDER THAT THE JUDGMENT BE PAID IN INSTALLMENTS-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; TELLO'S ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; ABC ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; ABC ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; ABC ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (DOE DEFENDANTS 1 - 100 ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (RE: JIN KIM IN SUPPORT OF REQ. FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JIN KIM IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO [C.C.P. SECTION 585(D) & C.C.P. SECTION 1033] | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (JUDGEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (DOE DEFENDANTS 1 - 100 ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (JUDGEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (RE: JIN KIM IN SUPPORT OF REQ. FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JIN KIM IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO [C.C.P. SECTION 585(D) & C.C.P. SECTION 1033] | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (RE: JIN KIM IN SUPPORT OF REQ. FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (JUDGEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (DOE DEFENDANTS 1 - 100 ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (GEVORK DZHANOYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (GEVORK DZHANOYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (GEVORK DZHANOYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MAILING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MAILING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MAILING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM; ETC | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint PROCEEDINGS HELD | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) Filed by Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|